Financial history FIGHTING FIT TORFAEN

Charity Number: 1147079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £162.47k £142.93k £133.70k £149.72k £165.55k
Total expenditure £168.30k £114.67k £132.71k £159.58k £163.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £46.00k N/A N/A N/A