FIGHTING FIT TORFAEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Taekwondo lessons to adults and children of all ages and abilities and from all economic backgrounds. Provide access to a community gym that is available to all including disabled users. Provide other classes that fulfil our charity objectives by providing healthy recreation in the form of aerobics, legs, bums and tums, Pilates, circuit training and breakdancing classes. We provide a base.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torfaen
Governance
- 01 May 2012: Standard registration
- 02 March 2017: Funds received from 1110581 WELSH WTF TAEKWONDO ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Eustace | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jordan | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JO DRAPER | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.47k | £142.93k | £133.70k | £149.72k | £165.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.30k | £114.67k | £132.71k | £159.58k | £163.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £46.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION AND HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORLD TAEKWONDO FEDERATION STYLE TAEKWONDO AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS AS THE DIRECTORS SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. 2.THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR USE, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silva Lodge
Greenway Drive
Griffithstown
Pontypool
NP4 5AZ
- Phone:
- 01495769104
- Email:
- info@fightingfitgym.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window