Accounts and annual returns DEVON YOUTH JAZZ ORCHESTRAS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148112
Charity reporting is up to date (268 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 March 2025 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required