HOUSE OF PRAISE, CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include teaching, preaching and propagating Christianity as laid down in the Holy Bible. We share the good news of Jesus Christ with as many people as possible in our community. We also serve by meeting the physical, emotional and spiritual needs of our church members and members of our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 October 2012: Standard registration
- (RCCG) NECHELLS, BIRMINGHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abolaji Olorunkoya | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Boma Ashinze | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
OMONIYI BOBOYE | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAKEEM OLUWAFEMI BELLO | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.78k | £63.17k | £118.48k | £192.74k | £267.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.29k | £49.03k | £107.94k | £113.17k | £162.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: TO PRACTICE, TEACH, PREACH AND PROPAGATE CHRISTIANITY AS LAID DOWN IN THE HOLY BIBLE AND TO TAKE THE WHOLE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST TO ALL WHO DO NOT KNOW IT OR WHO HAVE NOT YET RECEIVED IT WHEREVER OPPORTUNITIES MAY BE FOUND. THE CHARITY SHALL SEEK TO FURTHER THESE OBJECTS THROUGH: 1. WORSHIP - "TO PARTICIPATE IN PUBLIC WORSHIP SERVICES TOGETHER AND TO MAINTAIN PERSONAL DAILY DEVOTIONS." (JOHN 4:24) 2. EVANGELISM - "TO SHARE THE GOOD NEWS OF JESUS CHRIST WITH AS MANY PEOPLE AS POSSIBLE IN OUR COMMUNITY AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD." (MATTHEW 28:18-20; ACTS 1:8; 2 PETER 3:9) 3. MINISTRY/MISSIONS - "TO SERVE UNSELFISHLY IN JESUS' NAME, MEETING THE PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, AND SPIRITUAL NEEDS OF THOSE IN OUR CHURCH, COMMUNITY, AND IN THE WORLD." (1 PETER 4:10,11; MATTHEW 25:34-40; 1 THESSALONIANS 5:11; GALATIANS 5:13) 4. DISCIPLESHIP - "TO HELP MEMBERS DEVELOP TOWARD FULL CHRISTIAN MATURITY AND TRAIN THEM FOR EFFECTIVE MINISTRY. TO PROMOTE PERSONAL, SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND DISCIPLESHIP THROUGH BIBLE TEACHING." (EPHESIANS 4:11-13; MATTHEW 18:20; 2 TIMOTHY 2:1,2) 5. FELLOWSHIP - "TO ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND PRAY FOR EACH OTHER AS MEMBERS OF THE FAMILY OF GOD. TO SHARE OUR LIVES TOGETHER." (1 JOHN 1:7; ACTS 2:44-47; HEBREWS 10:23-25; ROMANS 15:5-7; JOHN 13:34, 35)
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Bishops Gate
Northfield
BIRMINGHAM
- Phone:
- 07985588165
- Email:
- info@rccgnechells.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window