TIMEBRIDGE MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 15 August 2012: Standard registration
- 11 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUL 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND PRIMARILY THE FIELDWAY AND NEW ADDINGTON WARDS IN ORDER TO FURTHER THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT AND WELFARE THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window