Financial history VICTORY IN CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1147046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.43k £121.30k £136.49k £133.20k £163.77k
Total expenditure £107.71k £90.39k £126.11k £131.95k £142.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A