THE AFRICAN SCIENCE TRUCK EXPERIENCE (TASTE) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving practical science education in African schools, particularly by using mobile labs and teacher training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 May 2012: Standard registration
- TASTE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Buchanan-Hughes | Chair | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Maaroof Fakhri | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lina Munro | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
AARON BARKER | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.56k | £8.72k | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.09k | £26.24k | £74 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PRACTICAL SCIENCE EDUCATION IN AFRICAN COUNTRIES, ESPECIALLY BY MEANS OF MOBILE TEACHING LABORATORIES AND TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Hanover Court
Cambridge
CB2 1JH
- Phone:
- 07925240697
- Email:
- info@tasteforscience.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window