FUNGAL INFECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Raise awareness of fungal pathogens and fungal diseases amongst the general public in the UK and internationally. To Provide information to patients suffering from fungal diseases, in particular aspergillosis. To Advance education and promote research in all aspects of mycology, mycotic diseases, fungal toxicology and microbial diseases in general, particularly among physicians and scientists
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 2012: Standard registration
- 08 March 2013: Funds received from 1003361 THE FUNGAL RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Christopher Peter Conlon | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RODERICK HAY | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR PETER JOHN FOLKMAN | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAROLINE LOUISE PANKHURST | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Morgan | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP GLANVILLE OXNAM | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.47k | £137.09k | £32.38k | £74.40k | £111.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.52k | £173.24k | £102.58k | £97.41k | £111.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 2012
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE AREAS OF FUNGAL DISEASE, MYCOLOGY, FUNGAL TOXICOLOGY, FUNGAL PATHOGENS AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE AREAS OF FUNGAL DISEASE, MYCOLOGY, FUNGAL TOXICOLOGY, FUNGAL PATHOGENS AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Elsdon Place
St. Georges Wood
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE612GY
- Phone:
- 01670641145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window