THE HAPPY SMILE CHILDREN'S COMPANY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We sponsor families of sick, terminally ill and children with special needs by helping them cover the cost of traveling to & from hospital to see their child. Also we run a monthly raffle to raise money for equipment the children and their families may need whilst in hospital. Finally we run charity events and charity nights to help raise money for the hospitals and families we help and support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 2012: Standard registration
- 03 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THSCC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.62k | £0 | £0 | £101 | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.90k | £0 | £0 | £163 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 13 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 OCT 2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST FAMILIES OF SICK, TERMINALLY ILL AND SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN LIVING THROUGHOUT THE UK WHO ARE TRAVELLING TO HOSPITAL WITH THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN FOR TREATMENT OR HAVING TO STAY IN TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION PRIOR TO THEIR CHILD’S TREATMENT IN HOSPITAL, DURING THEIR COURSE OF TREATMENT IN HOSPITAL, DURING THE CHILD’S RECUPERATION AFTER TREATMENT OR REHABILITATION AFTER TREATMENT ENSURING THE CHILD IS AS NEAR TO PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL ASSISTANCE IF SO REQUIRED TO AID THEIR RECOVERY BY THE PROVISION EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT OR GRANTS TO HELP PAY FOR THEIR PARENTS AND FAMILIES TRAVEL AND ACCOMMODATION EXPENSES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window