THE ANN DODGSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the past year we have increased our promotional activity through the upgraded website and Facebook. We issued two grants and applications for grants continue to be open throughout next year, with France and the United Nations remaining the key focus. We have also approached University language departments and provided content for the ALL Conference, attended by language teachers in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Barrs | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|||||
James Jenkins | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Erica Schwiening | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Linda Fisher | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anne O'Reilly | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Barrs | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Bird | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Barrs | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Martine Gougam | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sinkinson | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £673 | £392 | £415 | £705 | £266 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £700 | £4.70k | £2.05k | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/11/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: A) ENCOURAGING YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO BE COMFORTABLE BEYOND THE BOUNDARIES OF THEIR OWN CULTURE AND BY PROMOTING FRENCH CULTURE. B) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE AND TRAINEE TEACHERS, PARTICULARLY PRIMARY TEACHERS, TO ENJOY, UNDERSTAND AND BE INSPIRED BY FRANCE – ITS PEOPLE, ITS LANGUAGE, ITS HISTORY AND ITS CULTURE. C) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE LEARN ABOUT THE UNITED NATIONS – ITS CHARTER, ITS PURPOSE, ITS RANGE AND ITS VALUE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE* IN THE SUBJECT OF FRANCE – ITS PEOPLE, ITS LANGUAGE, ITS HISTORY AND ITS CULTURE. "A” YOUNG PERSON” IS DEFINED AS BETWEEN 16-25 YEARS OF AGE. PRIORITY WILL BE GIVEN TO THOSE IN STATE EDUCATION BUT WITH EACH CASE BEING CONSIDERED ON ITS MERITS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COBBLERS
LINTON ROAD
HADSTOCK
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 4NU
- Phone:
- 07760484390
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window