CORNWALL COMMUNITY ACCOUNTANCY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An affordable community accountancy service for charities and community groups in Cornwall. We offer Independent Examinations, Payroll services, account management and training on all financial matters Bursaries are available. Please visit our website at www.Cornwallcas.org.uk for more information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 03 July 2012: Standard registration
- CCAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Acornley Mr | Chair | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Fisher | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dennis | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.74k | £57.80k | £47.78k | £54.56k | £51.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.99k | £50.75k | £52.61k | £53.78k | £52.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, SOCIAL ENTERPRISES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF THEIR RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY DEVELOPING, PROMOTING, CO-ORDINATING AND SUPPORTING COMMUNITY ACCOUNTANCY SERVICES AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND TRAINING FOR FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN CORNWALL AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Elms
61 Green Lane
Redruth
Cornwall
TR15 1LS
- Phone:
- 07867524663
- Email:
- accounts@Cornwallcas.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window