Financial history BRENT PUNJABI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.80k £0 £8.55k £5.96k £17.84k
Total expenditure £10.51k £0 £5.92k £8.81k £11.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.99k