THE ACES CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Although the Charity shall be for general Charitable purposes as above the Charity shall lay particular emphasis on supporting medical related Charitable causes and in particular medical causes related to conditions of the eye.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 June 2012: Standard registration
- 09 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13 | £0 | £0 | £16 | £17 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 27 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR. 3.3 ALTHOUGH THE CHARITY SHALL BE FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ABOVE THE CHARITY SHALL LAY PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON SUPPORTING MEDICAL RELATED CHARITABLE CAUSES AND IN PARTICULAR MEDICAL CAUSES RELATED TO CONDITIONS OF THE EYE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window