PHOENIX CANOE CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF WATER SPORTS AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £764 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- Haringey
- Harrow
Governance
- 03 September 2012: Standard registration
- 14 January 2013: Funds received from 1135991 PHOENIX CANOE CLUB
- PHOENIX OUTDOOR CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Ruth Chidlow | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jeanne Edwards | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gordon | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Victor James Moore | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DITTANY BAK OLESEN | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.82k | £190.27k | £135.60k | £185.07k | £176.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.27k | £172.87k | £114.97k | £182.24k | £201.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.80k | N/A | N/A | £7.42k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £764 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF GREATER LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR KAYAKING, CANOEING AND OTHER OUTDOOR SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 KENERNE DRIVE
BARNET
EN5 2NN
- Phone:
- 07837 585798
- Email:
- info@phoenixcanoeclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window