UPPINGHAM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Uppinghm is a full boarding school for boys and girls aged between 13 and 18 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£40,507,678
Donations and legacies | £2.16m | |
Charitable activities | £35.38m | |
Other trading activities | £1.93m | |
Investments | £707.06k | |
Other | £336.40k |
Total expenditure:
£39,508,064
Raising funds | £307.46k | |
Charitable activities | £36.88m | |
Other | £2.32m |
£496,308 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.63m | |
Charitable expenditure | £36.88m | |
Retained for future use | £999.61k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.63m | |
Charitable expenditure | £36.88m | |
Retained for future use | £1.50m |
People

582 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 30 |
£70k to £80k | 22 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£200k to £250k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Rutland
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA MATTHEWS | Chair | 06 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
Charles Lewis | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Willis George Poulter | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Robert Jackson | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Pearson | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
DYLAN JONES | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Juliet Jaggs | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Fairfax | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Clare Colacicchi | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Katharine Gaine | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Edward Timpson CBE KC | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
LUCY JANE WOMACK | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Keith Budge | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher King | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sarah Furness | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dominic Wallis Mr | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Very Reverend Christopher Dalliston | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr JONATHAN SCOTT | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.57m | £29.75m | £30.52m | £33.55m | £40.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.65m | £29.99m | £30.88m | £33.31m | £39.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.37m | £437.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £153.17k | £800.07k | £666.11k | £376.56k | £2.16m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.60m | £744.12k | £1.11m | £1.83m | £1.93m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £29.37m | £26.30m | £27.85m | £30.74m | £35.38m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £209.28k | £210.41k | £258.00k | £363.40k | £707.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £247.82k | £1.70m | £638.97k | £232.33k | £336.40k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £12.94k | £35.17k | £8.50k | £10.75k | £236.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £28.70m | £27.82m | £28.34m | £30.83m | £36.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £203.13k | £272.20k | £271.46k | £264.26k | £307.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £136.15k | £114.84k | £151.12k | £216.54k | £231.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £40.06k | £28.02k | £22.80k | £25.43k | £23.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.74m | £1.90m | £2.27m | £2.21m | £2.32m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £78.14m | £77.86m | £78.00m | £77.02m | £80.20m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.23m | £9.42m | £32.85m | £30.44m | £32.42m | |
|
Other assets | £25.86m | £19.04m | £10.43m | £9.97m | £8.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£4.65m | -£6.18m | -£4.82m | -£758.00k | -£431.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £41.39m | £34.44m | £46.49m | £45.03m | £46.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (OBJECTS) FOR WHICH THE SCHOOL IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION OF A BOARDING AND/OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN OR NEAR UPPINGHAM AND BY THE PROVISION OF ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES OR OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Linked charities
- ALLIN SCHOLARSHIP OR EXHIBITION
- ARCHDEACON ROBERT JOHNSON TRUST
- AUGMENTATION OF GUYTHER BEQUEST
- BOYLE PRIZE FOR SCIENCE
- COPE PRIZE FOR ENGLISH LITERATURE
- CROSTHWAITE MUSIC PRIZE
- CYRIL BUTCHER EXHIBITION
- DAVIES BEQUEST FOR BURSARIES
- DAVIES-COLLY HISTORY PRIZE
- EDWARD THRING EXHIBITIONS FUND
- FIGGIS POWELL EXHIBITION
- GRAHAM WILLIAMS PRIZE FOR DIVINITY
- GWYTHER BEQUEST
- HASELGROVE EXHIBITION
- HOWARD FIGGIS EXHIBITION
- HOWITT EXHIBITION FUND
- IAN CADBURY TRAVEL GRANT FUND
- IVOR RAMSAY PRIZE FOR SCRIPTURE OR FOR ENGLISH LITERATURE
- LOWER SCHOOL MUSIC MEDAL
- MCKENZIE PRIZE
- NEWTON PRIZE FUND
- NIGHTINGALE PRIZE FOR SCIENCE
- OWEN PRIZE FOR LATIN HEXAMETERS
- PARMITER PRIZE
- PERCY CHAPMAN EXHIBITION
- R L NETTLESHIP MEMORIAL PRIZE
- RAWNSLEY BEQUEST
- RICHARD HARMAN PRIZE FUND
- ROY SWEET SCHOLARSHIP
- SELWYN PRIZE
- STERNDALE BENNETT PRIZE
- THE BORTH PRIZE
- THE CONSTABLE PRIZES
- THE EDUCATIONAL FUND
- THE H W H BOTHAMBY BEQUEST
- THOMSON MEMORIAL ENTRANCE SCHOLARSHIP
- THRING CENTENARY FUND
- UPPINGHAM SCHOOL ASSISTANT MASTERS GAFFIKIN FUND
- UPPINGHAM SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
- WILLIAM A TURNBULL PRIZES
- WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
- YATES PRIZE
- 08 December 1961 : Standard registration
- 05 February 2009 : Removed
- 05 February 2009 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uppingham School
20-24 High Street West
Uppingham
Oakham
LE15 9QD
- Phone:
- 01572820626
- Email:
- bursar@uppingham.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window