Trustees BILTON AND WOODFIELD COMMUNITY LIBRARY GROUP
Charity number: 1148291

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRETA KNIGHT | Chair | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mary Roberts | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JACK GOULD | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hunter | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joyce | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN JEAN METCALFE | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.