CALVARY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-denominational charismatic church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLORIA WILSON-ANDOH | Chair | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV CHRISTOPHER WILSON-ANDOH | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV SAMUEL ADJEI-APPIAH | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED AGYEI NYARKO | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE NICHOLAS HAGAN | Trustee | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.72k | £84.39k | £127.91k | £208.62k | £255.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.11k | £60.11k | £94.24k | £135.31k | £203.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 December 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 December 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF GOD ABOUT HIS ONLY SON JESUS CHRIST. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 3. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CALVARY INT CHRISTIAN CENTRE
FORMER METHODIST CHURCH
53 CARDIGAN LANE
LEEDS
LS4 2LE
- Phone:
- 07951105267
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window