GIFTED AND TALENTED FOUNDATION AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engaging gifted and talented young people throughout London, and also paying school fees and scholastic materials for gifted talented disadvantaged children in uganda
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 September 2012: Standard registration
- GTFA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH NGOMA | Chair | 24 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Michael Kulumbavu Sempala | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Suzan Akech | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GERMINA NAMBALIRWA | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Michael Winner | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIET KYAKOBYE | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £120 | £1.00k | £0 | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £0 | £920 | £0 | £850 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 02 April 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 15 July 2023 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 08 July 2023 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 08 July 2023 | 830 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH A FOCUS ON HELPING THEM DEVELOP THEIR GIFTS AND TALENTS PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF YOUTH, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, LOSS OF PARENTS, LACK OF SUPPORT OR OTHER SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE (‘THE BENEFICIARIES’) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ADVOCACY, PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND TO SUPPORT THEIR PARENTS AND SCHOOLS IN AIDING THEIR DEVELOPMENT 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF BURSARIES, GRANTS AND ITEMS TO THE BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR PARENTS, CARERS OR SCHOOLS, TO BE USED FOR SUCH PURPOSES THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE UNDERTAKEN IN UGANDA, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, PAYING ATTENTION TO THE PARTICULAR CHARITABLE NEEDS OF AFRICAN YOUNGSTERS OR THOSE OF AFRICAN DISSENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Meridian Sports & Social Club
Charlton Park Lane
LONDON
SE7 8QS
- Phone:
- 07916825492
- Email:
- GIFTED.TALENTEDFA@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window