Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S OLTON SOLIHULL CHURCH OLTON SOLIHULL

Charity Number: 1147836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £689.51k £437.02k £97.21k £291.03k £138.55k
Total expenditure £130.48k £197.54k £110.88k £124.56k £150.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £667.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £9.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £12.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £269 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £600.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £130.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £418 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £840 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A