THRESHOLD SOCIETY UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular meditation and study circles in London, Kendal, Bradford and Manchester Weekend retreat at least once a year in August Occasional one-day retreats Many resources on international web-site, www.sufism.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Cumbria
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 November 2012: Standard registration
- 09 May 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2018 | 10/04/2019 | 10/04/2020 | 10/04/2021 | 10/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.34k | £32.38k | £37.77k | £11.57k | £9.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.78k | £34.61k | £35.89k | £10.75k | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 10 April 2019 | 08 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2019 | 08 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRACTICES AND TRADITIONS OF ISLAMIC SUFISM AND IN PARTICULAR THE TRADITIONS OF THE MEVLEVI SUFI ORDER, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- A) THE HOLDING OF REGULAR WEEKLY CIRCLES FOR MEDITATION, PRAYER AND STUDY OF THE WORK OF JALALUDDIN RUMI, IN LONDON AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UK WHERE THERE IS SUFFICIENT INTEREST TO FORM A REGULAR GROUP B) THE HOLDING OF WEEKEND RESIDENTIAL EDUCATIONAL RETREATS AND ONE-DAY EDUCATIONAL RETREATS C) TRAINING IN SUFI ‘WHIRLING’ (RITUAL DANCE), D) STUDY AND PRACTICE IN SUFI MUSICAL TRADITIONS E) DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING A WEB SITE, TO SERVE EXISTING STUDENTS AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAMIC SUFISM. F) PROMOTING THE MORAL AND ETHICAL PRACTICE OF MEVLEVI ADAB, THAT IS THE TRADITIONS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT, RESPONSIBILITY AND COMMUNITY SERVICE PROMOTED OVER THE LAST EIGHT CENTURIES BY THE INTERNATIONAL MEVLEVI SUFI ORDER, INSPIRED BY THE LIFE AND WORK OF JALALUDDIN RUMI G) PERSONAL SPIRITUAL TRAINING TO FACILITATE THE EXPERIENCE OF DIVINE UNITY, LOVE AND TRUTH IN THE WORLD BASED ON THE SUFI MASTER JALALUDDIN RUMI’S SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS ABOUT HUMAN TRANSFORMATION THROUGH LOVE AND HIGHER CONSCIOUSNESS H) ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE ARE SUITABLE WAYS OF PROMOTING OUR OBJECTIVES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAMIC SUFISM, PUBLIC TALKS AND LECTURES, AND STUDY CIRCLES TO IMPROVE UNDERSTANDING OF THE QUR’AN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window