W.A.M (WHAT ABOUT ME?)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing 1-1 support and group support and activities to Children & Young People affected by parental substance misuse. Giving children a voice ~ service users actively involved through consultation and participation on local service developnent and national agenda. WAMbles group, allotment group,work with The Office of the Children's Commissioner.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 December 2012: Standard registration
- 02 January 2013: Funds received from 1117180 WAM (WHAT ABOUT ME)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH PHILLIPS | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
SAMANTHA SYKES ISOBEL | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HOLLINGWORTH-SHAW optional | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221 | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £3.97k | £4.43k | £3.90k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 2011
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 5-19(FIVE TO NINETEEN)YEARS,WHO ARE ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY PARENTS,FAMILIES,CARERS OR FRIENDS WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO,OR DEPENDENT UPON,DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR ALCOHOL,SOLVENTS OR OTHER ADDICTIVE SUBSTANCES,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION,ADVICE,SUPPORT AND THERAPY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1ST FLOOR RANSOM HALL
RANSOM WOOD BUSINESS PARK
SOUTHWELL ROAD WEST
RAINWORTH MANSFIELD
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG21 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01623434644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window