POYNTON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The U3A is a self-help, self-managed charitable organisation for those no longer in full-time work. It provides opportunities for members to share experiences in a range of Interest Groups to pursue skills, knowledge and activities. We hold monthly meetings with speakers, and have over 30 interest groups including bird watching, walking, family history, bridge, reading, geology, languages etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 15 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hester Ormiston | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Clarkson | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Myerscough | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Burin | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Marsden | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Westbrook | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Storr-Best | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Barnes | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Batchelor | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.80k | £6.75k | £2.70k | £2.99k | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.76k | £5.94k | £1.54k | £4.07k | £5.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
POYNTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Clifford Road
Poynton
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK12 1JA
- Phone:
- 01625878116
- Email:
- enquiries@poyntonu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window