CLACTON SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision Of Sports Opportunities in the Clacton On Sea area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 26 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MERCEDES SURRALL | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CAVENDER | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.75k | £8.40k | £1.68k | £0 | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £8.78k | £8.23k | £3.03k | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Donne Drive
Jaywick
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO15 2ND
- Phone:
- 01255433542
- Email:
- ncavers@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window