LAY WITNESSES FOR CHRIST INTERNATIONAL - UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We reach out to the communities to positively impact others,especially children, young people and adults through Sports activities,Training,Tutoring, Mentoring,Counseling and RIGHT TRACK PROGRAM. Our Mission is to Inspire the Communities,motivate the youth, helping them to develop their talents and potentials thereby having a positive effect in transforming the communities in which they live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50,157 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Throughout London
- United States
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- LWFCI - UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Mapakou | Chair | 04 May 2012 |
|
|||||
Kafilat Folashade Ajayi | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH OGBEIFO BALOFIN | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIAM TUMUKUNDE | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHARON K LYNN MINGS | Trustee | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr SAMUEL JOSEPH MINGS | Trustee | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.27k | £21.06k | £45.01k | £72.43k | £80.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.39k | £29.19k | £37.91k | £76.22k | £80.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.25k | £3.39k | £31.11k | £50.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LWFCI-UK
BURC
20 WIDMORE ROAD
BROMLEY
KENT
UK
- Phone:
- 02035833005
- Email:
- admin@lwfci.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window