FISH NEIGHBOURHOOD CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote charitable purposes for the benefit of the residents of Barnes, Mortlake and East Sheen within the Borough of Richmond upon Thames, by providing assistance and support to relieve the needs, distress or suffering of the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,332 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
236 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 30 May 2012: Standard registration
- 11 November 2014: Funds received from 1083996 FISH NEIGHBOURHOOD CARE
- FISH (FRIENDSHIP INDEPENDENCE SUPPORT HELP) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheng Ming Yoe | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Sarah Kate Rennoldson | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Kenneth William Haynes | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Radway Williams | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Nix | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNE RAIKES | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jean-Louis Meath Evans | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Louise Payne | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.13k | £198.73k | £158.02k | £201.28k | £258.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.84k | £115.57k | £163.27k | £215.33k | £309.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.08k | £21.85k | £17.79k | £28.16k | £25.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES, IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE RESIDENT IN BARNES, MORTLAKE AND EAST SHEEN, AND OF SURROUNDING AREAS IN ADJACENT LONDON BOROUGHS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND CARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARNES GREEN CENTRE
CHURCH ROAD
BARNES
LONDON
SW13 9HE
- Phone:
- 02088763336
- Email:
- info@fishhelp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window