MAKING CHANGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Domestic Abuse perpetrators programme providing group work sessions to male perpetrators (aged 18+).The programme is delivered by sessional facilitators and is delivered over a 27 week period and is based on the Duluth model. The programme is delivered in three venues in Newbury, Abingdon and Oxford. Referrals are received from a wide range of agencies and self referrals are also accepted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £11,000 from government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 10 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Diver | Chair | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Devine | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rob Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.63k | £16.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.70k | £45.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN AFFECTED BY DOMESTIC ABUSE IN WEST BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: •OFFERING A SPECIALIST SERVICE FOR THE INDIVIDUALS •AND PROVIDING EDUCATION TO MEN PRONE TO INFLICTING VIOLENCE TOWARDS THEIR PARTNER AND CHILDREN IN A GROUP WORK SESSION PROGRAMME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Heath Lane
Bladon
Woodstock
OX20 1SB
- Phone:
- 07765931260
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window