REDLAND PRESCHOOL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Redland Pre-School is a well established and friendly Pre-School affiliated to the Pre-School Learning Alliance, OFSTED & Bristol City Council. Redland Preschool employs a small team of well qualified staff who's ultimate aim is to provide a safe, caring environment in which children can learn. The educational activities provided for the children are in line with the Early Years Foundation Stage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 18 May 2012: Standard registration
- 28 June 2012: Funds received from 1026435 REDLAND PRE-SCHOOL
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- REDLAND PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.30k | £89.29k | £111.77k | £96.05k | £86.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.85k | £64.24k | £72.63k | £78.73k | £72.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.32k | £65.57k | £38.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 25 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | 25 February 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE ENHANCEMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 2.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OF ABILITY; 2.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; 2.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window