Financial history SOUTHWARK GOOD STEWARDS COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1147774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £120.13k £120.13k £97.70k £74.92k £45.65k
Total expenditure £123.77k £123.70k £88.13k £80.29k £46.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A