Accounts and annual returns RCCG NEW LIFE ASSEMBLY

Charity Number: 1147980
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 24 February 2025 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 24 February 2025 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 April 2024 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 13 April 2024 135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 23 March 2023 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 23 March 2023 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 April 2022 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 01 April 2022 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 19 February 2021 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 19 February 2021 81 days late Download Open in new window