Financial history RCCG NEW LIFE ASSEMBLY

Charity Number: 1147980
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £178.39k £172.06k £235.81k £210.00k £240.71k
Total expenditure £185.90k £172.26k £229.12k £216.27k £239.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A