RCCG NEW LIFE ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives and aims The principal objective of the church is the advancement of the Christian faith worldwide and relief of poverty. The principal activities of the church are Christian worship, Christian outreach programmes to increase awareness and to spread the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ and the development of the whole man.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Barnet
Governance
- 06 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Tokunbo Tunde Ibikunle | Chair | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Omolara Omowunmi Apoola | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Tokunbo Crescent Ibikunle | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Adebayo Phillips | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.39k | £172.06k | £235.81k | £210.00k | £240.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.90k | £172.26k | £229.12k | £216.27k | £239.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JAN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE THE RELIEF OF PROPERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCCG NEW LIFE ASSEMBLY CENTER
1 CARLISLE ROAD
KINGSBURY
LONDON
NW9 0HD
- Phone:
- 02082013017
- Email:
- accounts@rccgnla.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window