PACT FOR AUTISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PACT for Autism support families affected by Autism and other disabilities. See www.pactforautism.org.uk for further details.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £26,700 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Rich | Chair | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Draper | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hannam | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter McIntyre | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
WENDY DOROTHY DUNLOP | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.49k | £54.04k | £66.03k | £82.60k | £135.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.64k | £43.37k | £56.56k | £80.59k | £105.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £35.20k | £15.20k | £26.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/2012
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FOR AND ADVANCING THE NEEDS AND WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH AUTISM OR OTHER DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO LIVE IN HARLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR: A) SUPPORTING PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM (AND / OR OTHER DISABILITIES). B) IMPROVING PEOPLE?S UNDERSTANDING OF AUTISM. C) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE SPECIALISED EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM (OR OTHER DISABILITIES). D) RAISING AWARENESS THAT CHILDREN WITH AUTISM (AND OTHER DISABILITIES) CAN PROGRESS WHEN EDUCATIONAL NEEDS ARE MET AND THE CORRECT SUPPORT IS GIVEN. E) IMPROVING ACCESS TO LOCAL SPORT AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN WITH AUTISM (AND OTHER DISABILITIES). F) IMPROVING OPPORTUNITIES FOR WORK, SPORT AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR ADULTS WITH AUTISM (AND OTHER DISABILITIES). G) IMPROVING THE LIVES OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PACT FOR AUTISM
OFFICE 50
LATTON BUSH CENTRE
SOUTHERN WAY
HARLOW
ESSEX
- Phone:
- 01279430300
- Email:
- info@pactforautism.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window