HAMPSTEAD ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hampstead Arts Festival presents an annual series of concerts and conversations in various Hampstead venues. Its unique programmes are designed to engage as wide an audience as possible of arts enthusiasts from Hampstead and further afield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 17 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS JENNY WHITE | Chair | 11 March 2013 |
|
|||||
MAURITS Joost Felix Marie DOLMANS | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr ANNA ZELKINA | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS VALERIA VESCINA | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY KARPEL | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.02k | £631 | £480 | £480 | £405 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.62k | £1.77k | £2.82k | £2.60k | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/07/2012
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION OF THE CREATIVE AND PERFORMING ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO MUSIC, LITERATURE, PAINING, DRAWING AND SCULPTURE BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES AND EXHIBITIONS AT AN ANNUAL ARTS FESTIVAL IN HAMPSTEAD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND AT SUCH OTHER TIMES AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL DETERMINE. 2)TO MAKE GRANTS TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HAMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Sproull & Co
First Floor, Jebsen House
53-61 High Street
RUISLIP
Middlesex
HA4 7BD
- Phone:
- 07903525148
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window