NEPTUNE SAILING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate young people through the provision of sailing and other related activities through training and so as to develop their sailing skills as well as their physical, mental and social capabilities. To promote community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities for sailing, in particular dinghy sailing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 September 2012: Standard registration
- 21 March 2019: Funds received from 1103532 MONTGOMERY OUTREACH TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICK LEVERETT | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clarke | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Waller | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
NEIL PETER MCCARTHY | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL HOLMES | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALAN HORN | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.71k | £30.06k | £24.20k | £12.21k | £20.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.58k | £18.03k | £29.90k | £23.64k | £30.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING, IN PARTICULAR DINGHY SAILING. (2) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAILING OR SAILING RELATED ACTIVITIES AND OTHER TRAINING AND SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neptune Sailing
Cat House Lane
Woolverstone
IPSWICH
IP9 1AU
- Phone:
- 01473829600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window