Accounts and annual returns ST. MICHAEL'S PLAYGROUP OF LOUTH

Charity number: 1148904
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 March 2022 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 March 2022 405 days late