HOLME GRANGE SCHOOL PARENTS AMENITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Most activities are mostly based in and around Holme Grange School and all involve fundraising for the school. Individual annual activities include a Bonfire Night Display, Quiz Night, Summer Fete, and Christmas Fayre. The Annual Dinner dance is normally off sight in a local golf club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 September 2012: Standard registration
- HGSPAA (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauryn Michelle Lancaster | Chair | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Orriss | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Huzzey | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Susan Webb | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Johnston Sleator | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire-Louise Robinson | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.91k | £18.18k | £7.15k | £48.55k | £60.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.63k | £9.95k | £7.26k | £52.93k | £66.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 January 2021 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 January 2021 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APR 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Holme Grange School
Heathlands Road
Wokingham
Berkshire
RG40 3AL
- Phone:
- 07753904332
- Email:
- hgpaafinance@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window