THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST LEONARD, HORBURY WITH ST JOHN, HORBURY BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a CofE Parish in Horbury, Wakefield, West Yorkshire with 2 churches. Our Vision includes reaching out to the community and offering a friendly welcome to the Christian way of life. We are heavily involved with local schools, British Legion and Horbury Churches Together as well as activities for all age groups.Further info at www.horburychurch.com.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST PETER'S, HORBURY WITH ST JOHN'S, HORBURY BRIDGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Father Christopher | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Stead | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
bev gordon | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Father Daniel Heaton | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
carol tattersfield | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret Oakes | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Brackeley | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE PATTERSON | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FRANK WOOD | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN RAMSDALE | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HAZEL HOLDSWORTH | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE CROWTHER | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|||||
MAVIS WALSH | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.09k | £55.45k | £59.19k | £141.51k | £164.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.03k | £59.38k | £132.87k | £142.68k | £182.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St.Peters Church
St Peters Vicarage
Northgate
Horbury
Wakefield
West Yor
- Phone:
- 01924576745
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window