Trustees SPARK INSIDE
Charity number: 1148420

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erica Louise Handling | Chair | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Fionnuala Patricia Gordon | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Noelle Dunne | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jaskaren Singh Dayal | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jayne Whitehead | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Drysdale | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Case | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Michelle Davin | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Olutope Lyseight | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Douglas MacLellan | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ROBERT DOUGLAS FERGUSON | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.