LANCASTER & MORECAMBE DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of parents that hold activities for deaf children, young people and their families. Activities include swimming, bowling, megazone, under 5's stay & play, art & crafts for the 4-7 years, and sports sessions for the 4-7 years. We also hold several parties each year and have run educational workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 May 2012: Standard registration
- LAMDCS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Sarjent | Chair | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Rawlings | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Sealey | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Bisgrove | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE WINDLE | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £293 | £182 | £2.25k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79k | £0 | £844 | £1.86k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUL 2009
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER IN EVERY WAY ALLOWED BY LAW THE EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF DEAF CHILDREN WITHOUT REGARD TO RACE RELIGION CREED DISABILITY SEX OR FAMILY CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Garfield Avenue
LANCASTER
LA1 5ET
- Phone:
- 07999981197
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window