Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST NORBERT'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 August 2024 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 July 2023 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required