TOMORROW'S WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tomorrow's Women delivers a comprehensive, women-centred approach to minimising female imprisonment and offending. It does this by reducing the personal, social, health and economic disadvantages experienced by women through working in partnership to improve access to all relevant services and community resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income:
£842,034
Donations and legacies | £32.08k | |
Charitable activities | £801.21k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £8.75k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£731,502
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £731.50k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £250,197 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £731.50k | |
Retained for future use | £110.53k |
People

20 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 03 September 2012: Standard registration
- 06 November 2023: Funds received from 1169448 NEW BEGINNINGS COUNSELLING FOR WOMEN
- TOMORROW'S WOMEN WIRRAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN THOMPSON | Chair | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Jane Jones | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Richard Anthony Willcox | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Cordell | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Dodd | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hayes | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jones | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Jones | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Rosemary Jones | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN VINCENT SWEENEY | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adam Woodcock | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER LUCAN-PRATT | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £452.63k | £520.26k | £468.06k | £727.43k | £842.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.31k | £418.00k | £431.76k | £539.76k | £731.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.64k | £42.59k | £48.52k | £130.57k | £250.20k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £26.26k | N/A | £21.06k | £32.08k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £490.92k | N/A | £702.80k | £801.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.08k | N/A | £3.57k | £8.75k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £418.00k | N/A | £539.76k | £731.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | £1.20k | £1.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £45.51k | N/A | £89.42k | £84.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £448.47k | N/A | £640.19k | £751.81k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £8.42k | N/A | £20.08k | £15.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 APR 2012 as amended on 10 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING WOMEN NORMALLY (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) RESIDENT IN WIRRAL (‘THE BENEFICIARIES’) FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN, CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); (2)TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION AND REHABILITATION OF BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECT TO A CRIMINAL CHARGE AND HAVE SUFFERED A RESTRICTION OF LIBERTY IN THE COMMUNITY OR IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): I.THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; II.PROVIDING OR ARRANGING ACCESS TO TRAINING AND EDUCATION; III.ADVANCING THE HEALTH, SAFETY AND PSYCHOLOGICAL WELL BEING OF THE BENEFICIARIES. (3)FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): I.ARRANGING AND CO-ORDINATING THE DELIVERY OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES; II.PROVIDING OR ARRANGING ACCESS TO TRAINING AND EDUCATION AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION; III.THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE BENEFICIARIES’ INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tomorrow's Women
Beckwith Street East
Birkenhead
Wirral
Merseyside
CH41 3JE
- Phone:
- 01516477907
- Email:
- admin@tomorrowswomen.org.uk
- Website:
-
tomorrowswomen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window