Financial history THE CHALICE WELL TRUST

Charity number: 1147343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £566.94k £278.50k £489.30k £528.88k £830.50k
Total expenditure £514.02k £386.56k £465.99k £451.83k £612.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £102.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.29k N/A N/A £4.61k £156.02k
Income - Other trading activities £158.18k N/A N/A £90.54k £188.82k
Income - Charitable activities £402.92k N/A N/A £425.05k £455.50k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.55k N/A N/A £8.68k £30.15k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £409.09k N/A N/A £425.10k £578.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds £104.94k N/A N/A £4.29k £6.12k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £20.25k £15.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £22.45k £27.94k