STAKEHOLDER DEMOCRACY NETWORK

Charity number: 1148143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support the efforts of those affected by extractive industries & weak governance through rights based community empowerment. We strive to protect human rights & demand responsive governance. Our pillars of research & advocacy help facilitate communities & civil society to negotiate with other stakeholders, to get a better deal from the investments & operations that affect their lives

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SDN (Working name)
  • STAKEHOLDER DEMOCRACY NETWORK LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donald Mark Pearson Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Ibiba Don Pedro Trustee 23 November 2018
None on record
Prof. Mark Anikpo Trustee 23 November 2018
None on record
Rowland Ekperi Trustee 23 November 2018
None on record
JOSIE D' ANGELO Trustee 18 June 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.92m £625.34k £643.17k £1.08m £875.31k
Total expenditure £1.76m £950.70k £756.77k £1.05m £1.06m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £844.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.44k £34.88k £11.79k £1.91k £2.88k
Income - Other trading activities £8.35k £458 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.88m £589.99k £631.37k £1.08m £872.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £128 £13 £8 £0 £106
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £46 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £936.52k £756.77k £839.51k £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £45.05k £0
Expenditure - Governance £17.90k £11.86k £12.02k £12.74k £11.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £76.19k £36.00k £20.33k £25.57k £70.70k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.16k £14.17k £0 £164.22k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets £33.72k £18.62k £19.39k £8.19k £12.79k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £649.01k £317.26k £477.86k £909.55k £149.26k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £45.46k £18.52k £290.61k £676.41k £107.66k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stakeholder Democracy Network
The Green House
244 - 254 Cambridge Heath Road
London
E2 9DA
Phone:
02035596662