Accounts and annual returns THE HARRY MATTHEWS BOWEL TRANSPLANT TRUST

Charity Number: 1148642
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 12 October 2017 09 March 2019 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2016 22 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2015 16 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2015 Not Required