THE ELLIOT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Elliot Foundation exists to support the charitable aims of the Elliot Foundation Academies Trust, of which it is approved as Sponsor by the Department for Education. In addition to providing independent oversight, the Elliot Foundation also raises funds to support scalable charitable programmes to meet the educational and non-educational needs of the communities served by the Trust's schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 December 2012: Standard registration
- TEF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH CAMERON | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HUGH RICHARD GREENWAY | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
HENRY BEDFORD | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Whalley CBE | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21 | £18.45k | £4 | £2 | £55.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £18.00k | £375 | £200 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY SPONSORING, CO-SPONSORING, SUPPORTING, ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Elliot Foundation
144 York Way
LONDON
N1 0AX
- Phone:
- 02072787131
- Email:
- info@elliotfoundation.co.uk
- Website:
-
Elliotfoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window