SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of Union the advancement of: (a) the Christian Faith in accordance with the Doctrinal Standards and the Discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, District, Circuit, Local or other organisation of the Methodist Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

35 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 02 December 2013: Previously excepted registration
- 14 July 2020: Funds received from 1134233 STRATFORD AND EVESHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
- MID-WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Iain Mark Ballard | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howe | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Henwood Hicks | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Michael Butterworth | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Christopher Alan Benson | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Keverne Sandy | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Maurice Roy Mills | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Matthew Timmins | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Neil Ledgard | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Tina Jane Brooker | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lindsey Gail Sullivan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Hayward | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Edward Royle | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
TBA Penelope Sharples | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Roger Ian John Carter | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Victoria Grant | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Edward Burrows | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Elizabeth Lloyd | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA QUARTERMAN | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sally McCawley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Deacon Jane Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Davidson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Brown | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH OLIVER | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Lesley Jane Rimell | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Ann Jones BMus,PCGE, | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
David James Witham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Steele | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rosina Margaret Blakemore | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Eric Brian Mason | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Walton Wilde | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL BLACKWELL | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR WILLS FCA | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|||||
MARGARET BULL | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.20k | £1.13m | £338.23k | £312.96k | £335.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.35k | £700.87k | £449.89k | £420.29k | £417.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £285.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £25.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £821.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £698.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £2.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £2.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Northvale Close
Kenilworth
CV8 2EN
- Phone:
- 07578 640013
- Email:
- swc.katetennyson@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window