THE MORECAMBE WARBLERS AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the society shall be the study and performance of Operatic works, Musical comedies, Theatrical productions, etc. in the Lancaster and Morecambe area. Last year we performed Sweeney Todd which has recently been nominated for three NODA awards, including Best Show; Best Director & Best Actress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Joseph Beamer | Chair | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bob Bailey | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christian Butterworth | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gail Butterworth | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.97k | £1.58k | £1.13k | £47.70k | £40.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.44k | £3.35k | £1.75k | £42.60k | £43.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 January 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION TO THE PUBLIC OF CHORAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE CHOIR MAY DECIDE UPON FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 WILSON GROVE
HEYSHAM
MORECAMBE
LA3 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01524858557
- Website:
-
morecambewarblers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.