Trustees COUNTERPOINTS ARTS
Charity number: 1150079

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noora Firaq | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Holly Rose Robinson | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Jan Brulc | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sahar Halaimzai | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ali Ghaderi Nejad | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huda Jawad | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malu Ansaldo | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naima Khan | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.