Financial history CHISEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1148250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.41k £10.63k £8.89k £6.95k £9.88k
Total expenditure £18.63k £7.21k £9.54k £8.20k £10.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A