COLW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main work of the Charity is offering spaces for people to grow in the freedom of living out of their heart's deepest desire so as to experience the joy of living in the fullness of the call to life and love. In view of this we offer hospitality to visitors at House of the Divine Will, parish missions, outreach to schools, chaplaincy, ecumenical and interreligious work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 December 2012: Standard registration
- THE COMMUNITY OF OUR LADY OF WALSINGHAM (Working name)
- COLW LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sr Gabriela Gasz | Chair | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sudlow | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Sudlow | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sr Theresa Weight | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sr Camilla Mary-Magdalen Oberding | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Fr Matthew Blake OCD | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Fr Christopher Francis Brooks | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.14k | £115.64k | £132.65k | £173.97k | £132.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.63k | £91.79k | £96.14k | £87.13k | £107.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/01/2013
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION; 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3.1.3 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY THE LAW FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE DIRECTORS/TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. PROVIDED THAT THE OBJECTS ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE VALUES AND ETHOS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
House of the Divine Will
Neatherd Moor
Dereham
NR20 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01362692574
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window